Accounts and annual returns NEWTOWN ROUND TABLE CHARITABLE TRUST FUND

Charity Number: 1086944
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2015 30 July 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2015 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2014 28 July 2014 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2014 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2013 31 October 2013 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2013 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2012 17 December 2012 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2012 Not Required