THE EARTH CENTRE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- Barnsley
- Doncaster
- Rotherham
- Sheffield City
Governance
- 20 March 1997: Standard registration
- 15 March 2006: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- EARTH CENTRE (Working name)
- THE EARTH CENTRE CHARITABLE TRUST (Working name)
- THE EARTH CENTRE (Previous name)
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2005 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2005 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2004 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2004 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 25 JUNE 1990 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 13 JANUARY 1997 AND CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 13 DECEMBER 1995 AND SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 30 APRIL 2003
Charitable objects
3.1(A) TO CONSERVE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC AT LARGE, LAND AT DENABY MAIN AS A HABITAT FOR WILDLIFE AND THE FLORA AND FAUNA OF THE DON VALLEY AND TO ADVANCE PUBLIC EDUCATION IN MATTERS RELATING TO THE FLORA AND FAUNA SO CONSERVED 3.1(B)TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC ON THE NATURAL ENVIRONMENT AND ITS INTERRELATIONSHIP WITH THE SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC ACTIVITIES OF HUMANKIND BY THE PROVISION OF PUBLIC EXHIBITION CENTRES AND RELATED EDUCATIONAL ACTIVITIES ,AND; 3.1(C) TO PROMOTE AND CONDUCT RESEARCH IN FIELDS OF STUDY RELATIVE TO THE NATURAL ENVIRONMENT AND ITS INTERRELATIONSHIP WITH THE SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC ACTIVITIES OF HUMANKIND AND TO PUBLISH THE USEFUL RESULTS THEREOF.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window