Financial history TYLDESLEY AND DISTRICT HISTORICAL SOCIETY

Charity Number: 1073226
Removed charity

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2008 30/06/2009 30/06/2010 30/06/2011 30/06/2012
Total gross income £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A