EVANGEL CHURCH (DURHAM)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity represents a Christian congregation in Chester le Street, Co Durham providing pastoral ministry, public worship services, children and young people's work, evangelism, and teaching. It accommodates Durham Christian Partnership's rehabilitation, counselling and food bank collection work .It supports missionaries in UK and overseas, but does not respond to unsolicited funding requests .
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £280 from 1 government contract(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Durham
Governance
- 14 July 2000: Standard registration
- 01 February 2024: Funds received from 515572 JEZREEL NEW TESTAMENT CHURCH
- EVANGEL CHURCH CHESTER-LE-STREET (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev JOSEPH CORRY WALTON BAHonsPGSE | Chair | 18 September 1998 |
|
|
||||
Christine Alice May Wilson BSc Hons | Trustee | 20 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Shirley Linda Lewis | Trustee | 05 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
KENNETH JOHN PARSONS CA | Trustee | 18 September 1998 |
|
|
||||
SANDRA ROONEY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £38.85k | £37.09k | £46.29k | £46.26k | £52.65k | |
|
Total expenditure | £30.21k | £29.50k | £44.70k | £57.14k | £38.17k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £380 | N/A | £160 | £160 | £280 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 10 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 10 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 15 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 15 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 14 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 14 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 07 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 07 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 18 SEPTEMBER 1998 as amended on 01 Apr 2019
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE CHRISTIAN RELIGION, IN PARTICULAR TO CONTINUE AN EXISTING AND GROWING WORK AS A CHURCH IN CHESTER-LE-STREET, CO DURHAM AND IN SUCH OTHER PLACE OR PLACES AS SHALL BE DECIDED UPON THE FURTHERANCE OF THE OTHER CHARITABLE WORK OF THE CHURCH CONSISTENTLY WITH THE DOCTRINES BY PROCLAIMING AND FURTHERING THE GOSPEL OF GOD CONCERNING HIS SON JESUS CHRIST OUR LORD AND THE PREACHING AND TEACHING OF THE WORD OF GOD ("THE GOSPEL") CONSISTENTLY WITH THE STATEMENT OF FAITH
Area of benefit
CHESTER-LE-STREET
Contact information
- Address:
-
Clifford Terrace
Chester le Street
DH3 3JL
- Phone:
- 01913869875
- Email:
- evangelchurch@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window