THE SOUTHEND CHURCH OF ENGLAND EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
SCHEME BY MINISTRY OF EDUCATION UNDER CHARITABLE TRUST ACTS 1853 & 1925. TRUSTEES ADMINISTER THE CHURCH ROOMS AND THE CAPITAL PROCEEDS FROM THE SALE OF SOUTHEND CHURCH OF ENGLAND SCHOOL AND DISTRIBUTE THE INCOME THEREFROM IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE SCHEME
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Somerset
Governance
- 20 February 1963: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Nicholas David Jerrett | Trustee | 10 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Elysse Ward | Trustee | 03 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ingrid Edginton | Trustee | 03 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Geoff Wilson | Trustee | 07 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
IAN ROYLE JONES | Trustee | 09 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
TERENCE LESLIE HACKLING | Trustee | 11 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
VINCENT ALAN LEAN | Trustee | 18 April 2016 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £13.88k | £10.30k | £11.81k | £12.74k | £28.52k | |
|
Total expenditure | £12.11k | £16.48k | £13.66k | £20.55k | £15.63k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 10 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 10 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 11 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 22 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 18 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 20 March 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 9 MARCH 1954 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 24/08/2015
Charitable objects
PURPOSES OF A SUNDAY SCHOOL AND CHURCH OF ENGLAND RELIGIOUS INSTRUCTION CLASSES, EVENING OR OTHER CLASSES PHYSICAL INSTRUCTION BY MEANS OF A GYMNASIUM OR OTHER-WISE. THE ADVANCEMETN OF EDUCATION BY MEANS OF A LIBRARY OR READING ROOM, OR THE PROVISION OF SOCIAL, RECREATIONAL AND PHYSICAL TRAINGING.MAINTENANCE OF THE PREMISES OF THE FOUNDATION.
Area of benefit
ANCIENT ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF CHARD.
Contact information
- Address:
-
C/O The Parish Office
St Mary's Church Centre
Holyrood Street
Chard
Somerset
TA20 2DN
- Phone:
- 0146067867
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window