HUCKNALL HOPE LEA PROJECT LTD

Charity number: 1069660
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To provide Residential, Supported Living and Day Services for adults with learning disabilities who live in Hucknall and surrounding areas.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £297,969
Total expenditure: £317,020

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Disability
  • Accommodation/housing
Who the charity helps:
  • People With Disabilities
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Nottinghamshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 21 May 1998: Standard registration
  • 25 January 2023: Funds received from 1033406 INNER WHEEL CLUB OF HUCKNALL BENEVOLENT FUND
  • 25 January 2023: Funds received from 1036329 ST JOHN'S DAY CENTRE AND LUNCHEON CLUB FOR THE ELD...
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:

No other names

Company number:
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
  • Care Quality Commission
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Kevin Thomas Rostance Chair 21 November 2022
None on record
Zoe Anne MacGregor Trustee 20 November 2023
None on record
Joan Brinklow Trustee 21 November 2022
None on record
Richard Darrington Trustee 25 October 2021
None on record
Duane Underwood Trustee 25 October 2021
None on record
Jacky Vere Trustee 18 March 2019
None on record
KIM MARIE CHALLAND Trustee 18 March 2019
None on record
NORAH HATTON Trustee 01 June 1998
None on record
Janet Simpson Trustee 01 June 1998
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £240.37k £273.53k £273.20k £293.95k £297.97k
Total expenditure £250.98k £267.50k £264.60k £275.02k £317.02k
Income from government contracts £224.98k £251.32k £262.66k £259.40k £269.19k
Income from government grants N/A £11.18k £980 N/A £7.00k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 22 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 29 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 12 February 2024 12 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 12 February 2024 12 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 09 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 09 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 05 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 05 January 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 16 December 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 16 December 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
150 WATNALL ROAD
HUCKNALL
NOTTINGHAMSHIRE
NG15 7NH
Phone:
01159530825
Website:

No information available