Accounts and annual returns THE PARENT-TEACHER ASSOCIATION OF PAULTON SCHOOL

Charity number: 310207
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2024 20 March 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2023 17 September 2024 79 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2022 30 March 2024 274 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 30 March 2024 639 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 21 September 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required