Trustees THE CHESTERFIELD CANAL TRUST LIMITED
Charity number: 1071376

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr PETER GATESHILL HARDY | Chair | 17 November 2012 |
|
|
||||
Gemma Kate Gregory | Trustee | 14 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Geoffrey Twining Walker | Trustee | 18 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Roderick Dennis Auton | Trustee | 29 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Mark Ian Potter | Trustee | 24 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Iain Patrick Rowbotham | Trustee | 20 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Ruth Girling | Trustee | 22 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Jane Stephens | Trustee | 19 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
KATHLEEN AUTON | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.