U.K. COUNCIL FOR GRADUATE EDUCATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
UKCGE aims to advance graduate education in all academic disciplines in the UK. It does this through a range of activities such as the organisation of conferences and workshops focusing on topical issues, and the publication of reports and newsletters. UKCGE also promotes and conducts research surveys into graduate education, and provides postgraduate information to all interested parties.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

14 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 22 March 1997: Standard registration
- U K C G E (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
William Luke Windsor | Trustee | 12 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Susanna Broom | Trustee | 12 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Dr James Burford | Trustee | 12 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Dr Rachel Susan Arnold | Trustee | 12 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Professor Paul Brian James Wakeling | Trustee | 19 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Kay Guccione | Trustee | 22 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Rebekah Smith McGloin | Trustee | 22 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Janet Carton | Trustee | 24 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Halton | Trustee | 24 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Carolyn Laura Wynne | Trustee | 30 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Tina Ramkalawan | Trustee | 30 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr James Bruce | Trustee | 18 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Karen Clegg | Trustee | 18 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Associate Professor Michelle Morgan | Trustee | 02 July 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £195.48k | £247.00k | £239.10k | £284.02k | £386.26k | |
|
Total expenditure | £222.88k | £204.75k | £225.04k | £239.42k | £324.05k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 01 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | 01 May 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 19 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 19 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 02 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 02 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 10 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 10 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 10 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 10 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 08/02/1994 AS AMENDED ON 06/03/1994 AS AMENDED ON 19/01/1996 AS AMENDED ON 31/01/1997 AS AMENDED ON 14/02/2006 AS AMENDED ON 18/01/2011
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF GRADUATES.
Area of benefit
UNITED KINGDOM
Contact information
- Address:
-
UKCGE
THE FRIARY
LICHFIELD
STAFFORDSHIRE
WS13 6QG
- Phone:
- 01543308602
- Email:
- ukcge@ukcge.ac.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window