Trustees U.K. COUNCIL FOR GRADUATE EDUCATION
Charity Number: 1061495

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
William Luke Windsor | Trustee | 12 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Susanna Broom | Trustee | 12 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Dr James Burford | Trustee | 12 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Dr Rachel Susan Arnold | Trustee | 12 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Professor Paul Brian James Wakeling | Trustee | 19 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Kay Guccione | Trustee | 22 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Rebekah Smith McGloin | Trustee | 22 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Janet Carton | Trustee | 24 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Halton | Trustee | 24 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Carolyn Laura Wynne | Trustee | 30 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Tina Ramkalawan | Trustee | 30 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr James Bruce | Trustee | 18 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Karen Clegg | Trustee | 18 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Associate Professor Michelle Morgan | Trustee | 02 July 2018 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.