ASHFIELD HOME SAFETY EQUIPMENT PROJECT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide home safety equipment to families on low incomes with children under 5, to prevent home based accidents, such as falls, burns and poisonings.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Nottinghamshire
Governance
- 06 June 1997: Standard registration
- ASHFIELD HOME SAFETY PROJECT (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SHIRLEY ARMSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JANE SHUKER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JANET WALKER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/03/2020 | 30/03/2021 | 30/03/2022 | 30/03/2023 | 30/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £20.85k | £24.99k | £20.24k | £23.47k | £24.40k | |
|
Total expenditure | £20.08k | £21.94k | £21.75k | £21.99k | £21.69k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 March 2024 | 01 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 March 2023 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 March 2022 | 07 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 March 2021 | 20 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 March 2020 | 14 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 9 SEPTEMBER 1996
Charitable objects
(1) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION & RELIEVE POVERTY AMONGST PERSONS ON LOW INCOME BY PROVIDING ADVICE AND EQUIPMENT ON HOME SAFETY MATTERS, (2) TO PRESERVE AND PROTECT THE LIVES OF YOUNG CHILDREN BY EDUCATING FAMILIES WITH YOUNG CHILDREN IN HOME SAFETY MATTERS
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
ASHFIELD HOME SAFETY PROJECT
MORVEN AVENUE
SUTTON-IN-ASHFIELD
NOTTINGHAMSHIRE
NG17 1AN
- Phone:
- 01623517730
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window