RICHARD HUISH COLLEGE FOUNDATION

Charity Number: 310267
Charity reporting is up to date (14 days late)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To provide items, services and facilities for Richard Huish College To promote the educaton of persons under the age of 25 who are in need of financial assistance and who are about to attend the College, are attending the College, or have attended the College.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023

Total income: £11,158
Total expenditure: £18,581

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
Where the charity operates:
  • Somerset

Governance

Registration history:
  • 09 April 1963: Standard registration
  • 26 April 2002: Removed (Amalgamated)
  • 26 April 2002: Funds transferred to
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • HUISH'S GRAMMAR SCHOOL (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Jonathan Langdon Trustee 30 January 2024
None on record
Rev Tobie Osmond Trustee 31 October 2019
None on record
Timothy Duffen Trustee 04 June 2013
None on record
STEPHEN MICHAEL HARRISON Trustee 04 June 2013
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF SOUTH PETHERTON WITH THE SEAVINGTONS AND THE LAMBROOKS
Received: 102 days late
FRIENDS OF SOUTH PETHERTON CHURCH
Received: On time
Dr MARY TIGHE Trustee
None on record
DAVID JOSEPH WOOD Trustee
SOMERSET CRICKET MUSEUM LIMITED
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2019 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023
Total gross income £20.30k £16.39k £15.46k £11.10k £11.16k
Total expenditure £30.84k £14.25k £18.80k £18.85k £18.58k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2023 14 June 2024 14 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2022 30 May 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2021 07 March 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2020 21 October 2021 143 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2019 17 May 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
TRUST DEED DATED 2ND JANUARY 1967
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE A MEMORIAL TO THE FORMER PUPILS OF HUISH'S GRAMMAR SCHOOL WHO GAVE THEIR LIVES IN THE FIRST WORLD WAR.
Area of benefit
TAUNTON AND DISTRICT
Registration history
  • 09 April 1963 : Standard registration
  • 26 April 2002 : Removed
  • 26 April 2002 : Asset transfer out

Contact information

Address:
RICHARD HUISH COLLEGE
SOUTH ROAD
TAUNTON
TA1 3DZ
Phone:
01823320942
Website:

No information available