Financial history LEICESTER RAPE CRISIS LIMITED

Charity Number: 1095540
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £178.24k £193.91k £237.16k £256.85k £254.83k
Total expenditure £153.55k £153.25k £288.96k £258.71k £284.11k
Income from government contracts £24.55k £63.85k N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £24.55k £8.32k £58.13k £113.71k £81.46k