WHITBY DOG RESCUE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The care and re-homing of unwanted dogs
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Animals
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- North Yorkshire
Governance
- 14 June 2000: Standard registration
- WHITBY AND SCARBOROUGH DOG RESCUE (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Stephen Morrisey | Trustee | 24 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
CHRIS WATSON | Trustee |
|
||||||
MOLLY WATSON | Trustee |
|
||||||
JULIE MORRISEY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
BARBARA WYNN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £23.73k | £26.71k | £39.34k | £19.41k | £28.10k | |
|
Total expenditure | £31.68k | £16.49k | £26.00k | £29.98k | £43.17k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 03 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | 03 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 05 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 09 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | 09 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 16 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | 16 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 08 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 10 JUNE 1999 AS AMENDED 9 MARCH 2000
Charitable objects
[A] THE RELIEF OF SUFFERING AND DISTRESS AMONG DOGS AND THE CARE AND PROTECTION OF ANY DOG WHICH HAS NEED OF THIS BY REASON OF SICKNESS, MALTREATMENT OR NEGLECT IN ANY WAYS WHICH ARE DEEMED CHARITABLE IN LAW [B] THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE WAYS IN WHICH TO ACHIEVE THE ABOVE AND IN OTHER MATTERS OF GENERAL DOG WELFARE IN THE SCARBOROUGH DISTRICT AND SURROUNDING AREA
Area of benefit
SCARBOROUGH DISTRICT AND SURROUNDING AREA
Contact information
- Address:
-
ASP HOUSE
STAINSACRE
WHITBY
YO22 4LR
- Phone:
- 01947810787
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window