Trustees NEW WRITING NORTH
Charity number: 1062729

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Neil Kenneth Warwick | Chair | 04 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Helen Louise Dalby | Trustee | 11 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Livia Bird | Trustee | 11 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Maria Antoniou | Trustee | 04 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ted Hodgkinson | Trustee | 04 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Hector Miquel Vidal Dura | Trustee | 06 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Forster | Trustee | 07 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ian Crow | Trustee | 07 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Greenwood Dower | Trustee | 07 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Gary Robert Wright | Trustee | 07 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Clare Harington | Trustee | 06 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sara Lloyd | Trustee | 06 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Degna Michelle Aston Stone | Trustee | 05 December 2018 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.