THE ASSOCIATION OF CHRISTIAN RESOURCE ORGANISATIONS SERVING SUDAN (UK)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Raising funds to support the work of Across a Christian education & relief organisation working in South Sudan.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 09 June 1998: Standard registration
- ACROSS (UK) (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Colin Seadon | Trustee | 29 October 2019 |
|
|||||
RUSSELL JOHN NOBLE | Trustee | 29 October 2019 |
|
|||||
MARILYN NOBLE | Trustee | 29 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTINE MARGARET ANNE PERKINS | Trustee | 17 October 2017 |
|
|||||
JOHN PERKINS | Trustee | 08 September 2008 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.61k | £23.40k | £5.59k | £6.87k | £6.55k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.87k | £25.03k | £4.43k | £7.89k | £7.37k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 19 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 26 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 25 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 21 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 15 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 17 APRIL 1998
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF POVERTY THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION AND THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION OF PERSONS IN SUDAN, KENYA OR OTHER PARTS OF AFRICA
Area of benefit
SUDAN, KENYA OR OTHER PARTS OF AFRICA
Contact information
- Address:
-
18 Georgian Court
Sunderland
SR4 7LH
- Phone:
- 01915201996
- Email:
- acrossinfo@across-ssd.org
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window