THE KEN WRIGLEY MEMORIAL CHARITY

Charity number: 1071210
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The Trust Fund and its income is to be applied,at the discretion of the trustees, for the purpose of making grants for charitable purposes to individuals and organisations resident/situate in the Parish of Kinver in the County of Stafford.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024

Total income: £58,735
Total expenditure: £100,746

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Staffordshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 26 August 1998: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • KEN WRIGLEY MEMORIAL CHARITY (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Sharon Ann Hallmark Chair 12 October 2017
None on record
JULIA ANNETTE SAVAGE Trustee 28 May 2024
THE KEN WRIGLEY MEMORIAL CHARITY
Recently registered
ROTARY CLUB OF STOURBRIDGE CHARITABLE TRUST
THE CLAUDE BALLARD SOUTHALL MEMORIAL CHARITY
Received: On time
JOHN BRUCE ROSTRON Trustee
THE CLAUDE BALLARD SOUTHALL MEMORIAL CHARITY
Recently registered
THE KEN WRIGLEY MEMORIAL CHARITY
Recently registered
BLAKEDOWN PARISH ROOM
Received: On time
THE CLAUDE BALLARD SOUTHALL MEMORIAL CHARITY
Received: On time
THE ANTHONY AND GWENDOLINE WYLDE MEMORIAL CHARITY
Received: On time
THE A & G WYLDE MEMORIAL CHARITY
Recently registered
MARK ALLAN GUEST Trustee
THE KEN WRIGLEY MEMORIAL CHARITY
Recently registered

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £60.13k £47.87k £55.49k £58.42k £58.74k
Total expenditure £76.44k £61.19k £80.47k £90.43k £100.75k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2024 04 February 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2024 04 February 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2023 01 February 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2023 01 February 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2022 24 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 24 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2021 26 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 26 January 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2020 04 February 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 04 February 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
HIGGS LLP
3 WATERFRONT BUSINESS PARK
Brierley Hill
West Midlands
DY5 1LX
Phone:
03451115050
Website:

No information available