ROBERT RYCE'S CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
MAKE SMALL GRANTS TO SCHOOL LEAVERS, APPRENTICES AND THOSE ATTENDING FURTHER EDUCATION, FOR THE PURCHASE OF BOOKS,TOOLS, SPECIAL CLOTHING, AND FEES ETC. TO ASSIST THEM IN PURSUING THEIR CHOSE TRADE OR PROFFESSION.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Suffolk
Governance
- 04 March 1965: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Simon John Pitcher | Trustee | 06 May 2024 |
|
|||
Keith Davis | Trustee | 09 May 2014 |
|
|||
JANET ELIZABETH MARTIN | Trustee | 23 November 2012 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £150 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 23 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 23 July 2024 | 266 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 14 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 03 November 2021 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 05 March 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 4TH AUGUST 1905 AS VARIED BY SCHEME DATED 5TH APRIL 1921.
Charitable objects
IN ASSISTING POOR AND DESERVING PERSONS UNDER 21 YEARS OF AGE, WHO ARE ENGAGED OR ABOUT TO BE ENGAGED IN ANY TRADE, OCCUPATION OR SERVICE.
Area of benefit
THE PARISHES OF PRESTON AND LAVENHAM.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Addington House
Whelp Street
Preston St. Mary
Sudbury
CO10 9NL
- Phone:
- 01787247112
- Email:
- keithhdavis@btinternet.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window