Financial history Al Qalam Education Centre

Charity number: 1061318
Charity reporting is overdue by 128 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 28/02/2019 29/02/2020 28/02/2021 28/02/2022 28/02/2023
Total gross income £12.01k £13.99k £24.23k £76.27k £29.49k
Total expenditure £9.93k £10.36k £30.78k £15.24k £24.16k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £7.71k N/A N/A