GRANBY COMMUNITY MENTAL HEALTH GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
GCMHG - Mary Seacole House (MSH) is a multicultural mental health resource service primarily for people from BAMER communities who are living with mental health issues and who also encounter racism or discrimination in their day to day living. MSH provides a range of services for its users, i.e. Day Service Support, Mon-Fri, Advocacy Service, Training, Volunteers, and Student Placements, Mon-Fri
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £3,600 from 1 government contract(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Liverpool City
Governance
- 17 June 1997: Standard registration
- 28 August 2012: Funds received from 1093987 GRANBY COMMUNITY MENTAL HEALTH ADVOCACY PROJECT (G...
- MARY SEACOLE HOUSE (Working name)
- GRANBY MENTAL HEALTH GROUP (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Kahra Wayland-Larty | Chair | 12 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Byrne | Trustee | 01 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Janet Cornmell | Trustee | 13 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Thomas | Trustee | 12 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ayesha Euris Regina Bell-Gam Woto | Trustee | 12 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Mimoza Gashi | Trustee | 12 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Kemi Otubu | Trustee | 06 November 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £323.04k | £466.00k | £447.22k | £526.61k | £487.21k | |
|
Total expenditure | £361.36k | £348.80k | £409.41k | £478.67k | £585.48k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £13.71k | N/A | N/A | N/A | £3.60k | |
|
Income from government grants | £213.10k | £231.34k | £207.55k | £192.55k | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | £57.75k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £468.85k | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £478.67k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | N/A | £4.23k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 07 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 07 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 18 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 18 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 25 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 25 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 15 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 15 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 28/05/1996 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 12/11/1996 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 15/09/2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 24 APR 2019
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE ASSOCIATION ARE TO PROMOTE WITHIN (ENGLAND AND WALES) AND MORE PARTICULAR THE AREAS WITH A HIGH PROPORTION OF RACIAL MINORITY RESIDENTS WITHIN THE MERSEYSIDE POSTAL DISTRICTS TO ESTABLISH AND DEVELOP AMONGST OTHER LAWFUL THINGS THE SETTING UP OF BAMER (BLACK, ASIAN, MINORITY ETHNIC & REFUGEES) MENTAL HEALTH DAY SERVICES, FAMILY SUPPORT SERVICES, ADVOCACY SUPPORT, DROP IN CENTRES AND/OR RESPITE CARE OR BY SUCH OTHER MEANS AS HEREINAFTER PERMITTED THE PRESERVING AND THE SAFEGUARDING OF THE HEALTH AND WELL-BEING SUPPORT TO THOSE SUFFERING OR HAVING SUFFERED FROM MENTAL, PTSD (POST TRAUMATIC STRESS DISORDER) AND OR PHYSICAL DISORDERS. TO ALSO PROVIDE HEALTHY LIVING INITIATIVES, EDUCATIONAL AND CULTURAL ACTIVITIES, TRAINING ACTIVITIES AND LEISURE PURSUITS. TO WORK WITH ORGANISATIONS AND PUBLIC SECTOR AGENCIES WHICH PROVIDE SERVICES OF BENEFIT TO PRIMARILY BAMER COMMUNITIES. TO SUPPORT INDIVIDUALS/FAMILIES TO RELIEVE FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AND SICKNESS AND SUPPORT THOSE WHO ARE CARING FOR OR NURSING A PERSON WITH A MENTAL OR PHYSICAL DISABILITY IN ANY PLACE OTHER THAN AN INSTITUTION OR NURSING HOME AS DEFINED BY THE NATIONAL ASSISTANCE ACT 1948 AND CHRONICALLY SICK AND DISABLED PERSONS ACT 1970. TO SUPPORT THOSE WHO MAY BE CHRONICALLY SICK OR DISABLED BY THE PROVISION OF TRAINING AND ADVICE FOR THOSE RESPONSIBLE FOR THEIR CARE.(CARERS) TO ADVISE IN RELATION TO COMMUNITY LEARNING, PREPARE, ORGANISE, CONDUCT AND/OR SUPPORT TRAINING COURSES, EDUCATIONAL AND TRAINING EVENTS AND ACTIVITIES OF ALL KINDS. TO WORK WITH ORGANISATIONS AND COMPANIES WHOSE ACTIVITIES MAY FURTHER ONE OR MORE OF THE ABOVE OBJECTS, OR MAY GENERATE INCOME TO SUPPORT THE ACTIVITIES OF THE ORGANISATION.
Area of benefit
WITHIN THE METROPOLITAN DISTRICT OF LIVERPOOL AND MORE PARTICULAR WITHIN THE L8 POSTAL DISTRICT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
91 Upper Parliament Street
Toxteth
Liverpool
L8 7LB
- Phone:
- 0151 707 0319
- Email:
- info@maryseacolehouse.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window