MARY BARNES' CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Promoting the education (including social and physical training) of persons under the age of 25 years who are resident in the Parish of Stoke-by-Clare and who are in need of financial assistance.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Suffolk
Governance
- 13 October 1964: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ROGER ASHTON MCKENNY | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Edwin James Smith | Trustee | 22 February 2017 |
|
|
||||
Isobel Gill | Trustee | 17 February 2016 |
|
|
||||
LYNN SUSAN KOWALSKI | Trustee | 02 September 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.99k | £4.08k | £4.17k | £4.18k | £14.16k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.25k | £2.90k | £0 | £12.00k | £12.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 08 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 17 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 26 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 20 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 10 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 29TH JANUARY 1985
Charitable objects
IN PROMOTING THE EDUCATION (INCLUDING SOCIAL AND PHYSICAL TRAINING) OF PERSONS UNDER THE AGE OF 25 YEARS WHO ARE RESIDENT IN THE PARISH OF STOKE-BY-CLARE AND WHO ARE IN NEED OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE. (FOR DETAILS, SEE CLAUSE 25 OF SCHEME).
Area of benefit
PARISH OF STOKE-BY-CLARE
Contact information
- Address:
-
FARMERS FARM
STOKE BY CLARE
SUDBURY
CO10 8HU
- Phone:
- 01787277654
- Email:
- mckenny@btinternet.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window