Financial history BIRMINGHAM BOND SCHEME LTD

Charity number: 1061391
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2004 31/03/2005 31/03/2006 31/03/2007 31/03/2008
Total gross income £68.79k £115.51k £115.51k £89.40k £628
Total expenditure £68.69k £107.78k £107.78k £78.18k £18.00k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A