THE NEWARK AREA ARTS AND LEISURE FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote maintain improve and advance the education of the residents of Newark by the promotion of educational drama and other fine arts. It provides and assists in the provision of facilities for recreation and other leisure time occupation. The Charity also conducts research into the needs of the community and awards grants scholarships fellowships and prizes to further its' objective.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Nottinghamshire
Governance
- 25 April 1997: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MICHAEL DAY BEAUMONT CBE | Chair |
|
||||||||||
Jean Elaine Lebeter | Trustee | 16 May 2022 |
|
|
||||||||
JOANNA MARY PARLBY | Trustee | 09 October 2014 |
|
|
||||||||
JUSTIN DAY | Trustee | 01 October 2014 |
|
|
||||||||
IAN PHILLIPS | Trustee |
|
||||||||||
Andrew Jonathan Fearn | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.36k | £3.53k | £3.61k | £3.64k | £4.77k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.34k | £1.17k | £1.09k | £1.24k | £2.06k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 23 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 14 February 2024 | 9 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 23 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 21 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 17 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 12 MARCH 1997
Charitable objects
A. TO PROMOTE MAINTAIN IMPROVE AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE INHABITANTS OF NEWARK AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD THEREOF AND IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROMOTION OF EDUCATIONAL DRAMA AND OTHER FINE ARTS OF DRAMA MIME DRAMATIC IMPROVISATION LITERATURE DANCE SINGING AND MUSIC. B. TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR THE INHABITANTS OF NEWARK AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD THEREOF WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE AND IN FURTHERANCE OF THE SAID OBJECTS. C. TO CONDUCT RESEARCH INTO THE NEEDS OF THE COMMUNITY IN RELATION TO THE ARTS AND FOR THE PURPOSES OF SUCH RESEARCH TO GRANT SCHOLARSHIPS, FELLOWSHIPS AND PRIZES IN FURTHERANCE OF THE ABOVE MENTIONED OBJECTS.
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE NEWARK AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD THEREOF
Contact information
- Address:
-
Duncan & Toplis Ltd
14 London Road
NEWARK
NG24 1TW
- Phone:
- 01636 640321
- Email:
- ian.phillips@duntop.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window