HOME EDUCATION ADVISORY SERVICE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
For a subscription of £16 a year HEAS offers advice, support and information on all aspects of home educating school aged children and young people. Subscription gives access to subscriber-only areas of our website for resources and up-to-date news on educational issues of interest to home educators.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 02 July 1997: Standard registration
- H E A S (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Laurence Alton Lowe | Trustee | 28 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Paul Joseph Lowe | Trustee | 05 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
JANE LOWE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
BRENDA HOLLIDAY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.56k | £3.08k | £1.95k | £647 | £878 | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.91k | £3.15k | £2.71k | £3.68k | £3.54k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 03 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 01 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 12 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 07 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM & ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 4 JUNE 1997, AMENDED 10 APRIL 1999 AND 28 NOVEMBER 2007.
Charitable objects
(A) ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF SCHOOL AGE CHILDREN BY THE PROVISION OF A HOME EDUCATION SERVICE & ASSOCIATED FACILITIES; AND (B) ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE MATTER OF HOME EDUCATION
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
5 Elm Gardens
Welwyn Garden City
AL8 6RX
- Phone:
- 01707371854
- Email:
- enquiries@heas.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window