AFRICA OYE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The principal activity of the company is to promote concerts and festivals to celebrate the cultural heritage and music of Africa, the Caribbean and the Americas. Africa Oye has an international reputation for world class performances.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £277,459 from 3 government grant(s)
People

3 Trustee(s)
40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Knowsley
- Liverpool City
- Sefton
- St Helens
- Wirral
Governance
- 20 May 1997: Standard registration
- AFRICA OYE LIMITED (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rebecca Ross-Williams | Trustee | 30 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Anna Louise Maloney | Trustee | 07 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Serge Patrick Heselton | Trustee | 19 October 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £284.79k | £205.80k | £205.63k | £356.71k | £388.52k | |
|
Total expenditure | £325.95k | £111.85k | £194.82k | £420.20k | £459.92k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £191.05k | £202.68k | £192.68k | £199.68k | £277.46k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 25 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 25 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 18 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 18 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 26 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 26 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 1 NOVEMBER 1995 as amended on 08 Jun 2015
Charitable objects
TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN THE ART OF AFRICAN CARIBBEAN AND AMERICAS MUSIC, IN PARTICULAR BY PROMOTING CONCERTS AND FESTIVALS TO CELEBRATE CULTURAL HERITAGE AND MUSIC OF AFRICA, THE CARIBBEAN AND THE AMERICAS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
11 Seymour Terrace
Seymour Street
Liverpool
L3 5PE
- Phone:
- 01517086200
- Email:
- paul@africaoye.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window