SELBY ABBEY C.E.C. PRIMARY SCHOOL FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are a School in the Education Sector and the charity's activities raises funds to enrich the children's learning experience
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

12 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Other Charitable Activities
- North Yorkshire
Governance
- 13 February 2002: Standard registration
- SELBY ABBEY PRIMARY SCHOOL FUND (Working name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev JOHN WEETMAN | Chair | 23 September 2013 |
|
|||||||||
Shaun Donaghy | Trustee | 06 October 2016 |
|
|
||||||||
Debbie Ward | Trustee | 29 September 2016 |
|
|
||||||||
Neil Woodhall | Trustee | 01 September 2016 |
|
|
||||||||
Emma Ackroyd | Trustee | 01 September 2016 |
|
|
||||||||
Matthew Webb | Trustee | 21 March 2016 |
|
|
||||||||
Susan Thomson | Trustee | 05 July 2015 |
|
|
||||||||
Phillip Chinery | Trustee | 01 December 2013 |
|
|
||||||||
JACQUELINE ELAINE ENGELHART | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||
STEVE SHAW-WRIGHT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||
JOANNA JENNINGS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||
LISA BEASTON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £36.63k | £3.60k | £3.89k | £3.49k | £37.80k | |
|
Total expenditure | £30.21k | £3.61k | £2.08k | £1.44k | £25.89k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 16 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 09 February 2024 | 9 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 26 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 25 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 27 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 30 APRIL 2001
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE FUND SHALL BE TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS OF SELBY ABBEY C.E.C PRIMARY SCHOOL BY PROVIDING OR ASSISTING THE PROVISION OF EDUCATION, RECREATIONAL AND OTHER CHARITABLE FACILITIES IN AUGMENTATION OF SUCH FACILITIES FINANCED BY THE LOCAL EDUCATION AUTHORITY.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
SELBY ABBEY C OF E PRIMARY SCHOOL
NEW LANE
SELBY
YO8 4QB
- Phone:
- 01757703817
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window