Financial history HECKINGTON COMMUNITY SWIMMING POOL

Charity Number: 1098836
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £24.45k £0 £4.43k £21.02k £22.28k
Total expenditure £27.31k £2.57k £4.74k £21.04k £18.33k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £6.00k N/A N/A N/A N/A