Accounts and annual returns DOMESTIC ABUSE SERVICES

Charity number: 1063140
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2009 08 December 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2009 23 November 2009 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2008 25 November 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2008 10 October 2008 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2007 04 January 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2007 07 August 2007 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2006 28 November 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2006 17 August 2006 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2005 21 December 2005 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2005 21 December 2005 On Time