TOP CHURCH TRAINING

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance the education and develop the capacity and skill of the members of the socially and economically disadvantaged communities of The Black Country and surrounding areas in such a way that they are better able to identify and help meet their needs and to participate more fully in society.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 November 2023
Total income includes £59,000 from 2 government contract(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
75 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Dudley
Governance
- 07 May 1997: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Robert Anthony Bowker | Chair | 22 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Megan Price | Trustee | 15 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Mary Rowe | Trustee | 14 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Joanne Louise Goldie | Trustee | 14 December 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/11/2019 | 30/11/2020 | 30/11/2021 | 30/11/2022 | 30/11/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £232.61k | £281.07k | £207.92k | £284.00k | £251.52k | |
|
Total expenditure | £157.34k | £249.00k | £219.95k | £326.00k | £319.21k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £51.27k | N/A | £52.21k | £80.00k | £59.00k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £53.96k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 November 2023 | 02 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2023 | 02 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2022 | 14 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2022 | 14 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2021 | 19 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2021 | 19 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2020 | 29 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2020 | 29 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2019 | 19 October 2020 | 19 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2019 | 19 October 2020 | 19 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 6 MARCH 1997
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE INHABITANTS OF DUDLEY IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE PROVISION OF VOCATIONAL EDUCATION, TRAINING AND RE-TRAINING AND A COUNSELLING AND ADVICE SERVICE.
Area of benefit
DUDLEY
Contact information
- Address:
-
Harrys Cafe
65A High Street
BRIERLEY HILL
West Midlands
DY5 3AB
- Phone:
- 07894075612
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window