SEAHORSE WATERSPORTS CENTRE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
- Durham
- North Yorkshire
Governance
- 20 June 1997: Standard registration
- 11 November 2008: Removed (Does not operate)
No other names
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2005 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2005 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2004 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2004 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 1 FEBRUARY 1997 AS AMENDED ON 9 JUNE 1997
Charitable objects
(1) TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR THE RECREATIONAL AND LEISURE TIME AND OCCUPATION OF THE INHABITANTS AND CONURBATION OF TEESIDE AND ITS SURROUNDING DISTRICTS AND PRINCIPALLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY WATER RELATED ACTIVITIES AT THE SEAHORSE WATERSPORT CENTRE IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THE SAID INHABITANTS. (2) TO CONSERVE AND PROTECT FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT THE LAND OCCUPIED BY THE SEAHORSE WATERSPORT CENTRE PRESENTLY AND IN THE FUTURE WHICH IS OF SCIENTIFIC EDUCATIONAL VALUE
Area of benefit
TEESIDE AND ITS SURROUNDING DISTRICTS
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window