THE FERRIBY HERITAGE TRUST LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Ferriby Heritage Trust owns a half scale replica bronze age boat. We visit education establishments, and suitable sites to launch, thereby spreading the news of this unique find.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 25 April 1997: Standard registration
- THE FERRIBY HERITAGE TRUST LTD (Working name)
- THE FERRITY HERRITAGE TRUST (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ian Wiles | Trustee | 20 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
Roger David Waites | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £184 | £107 | £137 | £150 | £132 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 07 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 13 May 2024 | 103 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 24 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 25 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 28 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 24 MARCH 1997
Charitable objects
TO PROTECT, PRESERVE AND CONSERVE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT THE PREHISTORIC BRONZE AGE BOATS KNOWN AS THE " FERRIBY BOATS " INCLUDING SUCH REMAINS AS MAY EXIST AND TO BUILD A RECONSTRUCTION OR REPLICA AND TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN ALL ASPECTS RELATING TO THE FERRIBY BOATS, THEIR DESIGN, CONSTRUCTION, HISTORY, USE AND ALL OTHER RELEVANT MATTERS AND BY THE PROVISION OF AN EXHIBITION OR MUSEUM
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
48 SOUTHFIELD DRIVE
NORTH FERRIBY
HU14 3DX
- Phone:
- 01482632755
- Email:
- rw@wilberforce.ac.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window