MAYNARD'S EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provides financial assistance for educational activities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Suffolk
Governance
- 11 July 1968: Standard registration
- THE MAYNARD TRUST (Working name)
- Investment
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rachael Cooper | Trustee | 08 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jon Stenhouse | Trustee | 24 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Richard Giffin | Trustee | 26 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Michel Henri | Trustee | 04 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
POLLY POTTER | Trustee | 25 November 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.62k | £2.61k | £2.93k | £3.00k | £3.14k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.26k | £190 | £1.15k | £2.33k | £4.76k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 08 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 22 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 12 July 2024 | 255 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 14 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 14 February 2022 | 106 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME SCHEME OF THE BOARD OF EDUCATION DATED 30 JUNE 1922, AND RESOLUTION MADE UNDER SECTION 74(2) OF THE CHARITIES ACT 1993. AND RESOLUTIONS MADE UNDER SECT 74D AND SECT 74C
Charitable objects
A) GRANTS TO BE GIVEN FOR EDUCATIONAL AND TRAINING PURPOSES TO INDIVIDUAL RESIDENTS OF HOXNE PARISH. B) AN ANNUAL GRANT, TO BE CALLED THE MAYNARD AWARD, TO BE GIVEN TO ST EDMUND’S PRIMARY SCHOOL, AND TO BE ALLOCATED AS THE SCHOOL GOVERNORS SEE FIT.
Area of benefit
THE PARISH OF HOXNE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
54 Low Street
Hoxne
EYE
Suffolk
IP21 5AS
- Phone:
- 07756434808
- Email:
- richard.giffin@yahoo.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window