Financial history WOLVERHAMPTON MOSQUE TRUST

Charity number: 1062702
Charity reporting is up to date (20 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £143.47k £183.12k £207.31k £280.61k £326.40k
Total expenditure £182.86k £168.48k £221.03k £285.83k £302.21k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £48.34k £3.92k N/A N/A