CMC : PENSARN HARBOUR

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Outdoor education and training for people from all walks of life.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 24 April 1997: Standard registration
- CHRISTIAN MOUNTAIN CENTRE (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rachel Joy Gibbins | Trustee | 15 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Philip Geoffrey Tarr | Trustee | 12 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Andy Houghton | Trustee | 13 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Graham French | Trustee | 03 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Philip Kelly | Trustee | 03 March 2018 |
|
|||||
Christopher Cook | Trustee | 03 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
ALAN SANDERS | Trustee | 22 April 2017 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | 31/10/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £353.53k | £375.27k | £407.70k | £404.27k | £490.73k | |
|
Total expenditure | £346.13k | £343.96k | £420.91k | £460.09k | £423.25k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £97.25k | £60.50k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2024 | 25 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2024 | 25 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 28 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | 28 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 21 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | 21 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 01 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | 01 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 19 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | 19 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 27 FEBRUARY 1997 AS AMENDED 15 DECEMBER 1998 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 5 APRIL 2003.. as amended on 22 Apr 2017
Charitable objects
1. TO EDUCATE ADULTS AND CHILDREN WITH ALL NECESSARY FACILITIES THROUGH OUTDOOR PURSUIT ACTIVITIES TO DEVELOP THEIR PHYSICAL CAPABILITIES AND THEIR MENTAL AND SPIRITUAL AWARENESS AS INDIVIDUALS AND AS MEMBERS OF SOCIETY AND SO THAT THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE MAY BE IMPROVED. 2. TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH AMONG SUCH PERSONS AND THEIR FAMILIES. 3. TO ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF ANY OTHER CHARITABLE FACILITIES FOR SUCH PERSONS AND IN PARTICULAR TO MAKE GRANTS TO OTHER CHARITIES HAVING AIMS IDENTICAL OR SIMILAR TO THOSE OF THE CHARITY.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
CMC PENSARN HARBOUR LLANBEDR
GWYNEDD
NORTH WALES
LL45 2HS
- Phone:
- 01341241646
- Email:
- office@cmcadventure.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window