CASTLE BROMWICH INFANTS SCHOOL FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The object of the Trust shall be to advance the education of the pupils at Castle Bromwich Infant & Nursery School by providing or assisting in the provision of educational and recreational facilities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2022
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Other Finance
- Solihull
Governance
- 08 May 1997: Standard registration
- C.B.I.S. SCHOOL FUND (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SUSAN JOSEPHINE JEAN HEWLETT | Trustee | 01 September 2017 |
|
|||||
MAVIS AVERY | Trustee | 01 December 2014 |
|
|
||||
DEBBIE MANDELL | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2018 | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £51.48k | £17.18k | £6.23k | £5.69k | £13.92k | |
|
Total expenditure | £41.03k | £15.01k | £13.54k | £715 | £25.76k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 303 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 303 days | |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 03 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 18 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 27 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 06 October 2020 | 98 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 23 SEPTEMBER 1996
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS OF CASTLE BROMWICH INFANTS SCHOOL
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
GREEN LANE
CASTLE BROMWICH
BIRMINGHAM
B36 0BX
- Phone:
- 01217473369
- Email:
- OFFICE@CBINS.SOLIHULL.SCH.UK
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window