BENDALL EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Bendall was set up for the benefit of Mildenhall Church of England School as St Mary?s Church of England Academy was known at that time. The Foundation made a large contribution to the enlargement of the Main Hall and has regularly assisted with the purchase of equipment for the benefit of the pupils.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Suffolk
Governance
- 14 October 1964: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
REVEREND SUSAN LEATHLEY | Chair |
|
||||||
Roxanne Rutter | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
DEREK GEORGE KUZIW | Trustee | 01 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
VENEREABLE JOHN COX | Trustee | 20 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
ADRIAN FREDERICK JOHN PEACHEY | Trustee | 15 August 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.70k | £6.90k | £7.14k | £7.42k | £7.75k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.00k | £0 | £20.00k | £0 | £8.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 22 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 21 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 21 October 2022 | 83 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 30 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 24 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 5 JULY 1960
Charitable objects
1) ANNUAL PAYMENT FOR ALTERATIONS AND REPAIRS OF THE MILDENHALL CHURCH OF ENGLAND SCHOOL. 2) TO PROVIDE SPECIAL BENEFITS AT THE SCHOOL NOT NORMALLY PROVIDED BY THE LOCAL EDUCATION AUTHORITY.3) EXHIBITIONS TENABLE AT ANY SECONDARY SCHOOL, TEACHERS TRAINING COLLEGE , UNIVERSITY OR OTHER INSTIUTION OF FURTHER EDUCATION. 4) FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE ONLEAVING SCHOOL TO PREPARE FOR OF ASSIST ENTRY INTO A PROFESSION, TRADE OR CALLING. 5) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PERSONS UNDER THE AGE OF 25 YEARS WHO ARE IN NEED OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE.
Area of benefit
MILDENHALL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Whitings LLP
46 St. Andrews Street
Mildenhall
Bury St. Edmunds
IP28 7HB
- Phone:
- 01638712267
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window