LONG WHATTON COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TO SUPPORT THE ACTIVITIES OF THE LONG WHATTON COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION AND THE RESIDENTS OF THE VILLAGE OF LONG WHATTON
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £500 from 1 government grant(s)
People

13 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Leicestershire
Governance
- 28 January 1998: Standard registration
No other names
- Investment
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Vivienne Matravers | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Keith Nicholls | Trustee | 05 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Valerie Chadwin | Trustee | 05 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sonya Buzzard | Trustee | 15 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Karen Neil | Trustee | 15 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Alison Freestone | Trustee | 15 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Penny de kock | Trustee | 06 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Benjamin Kenneth Taylor | Trustee | 20 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Mike Hampton | Trustee | 12 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Silke Walker | Trustee | 15 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Richard EVANS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
GEOFFERY SMITH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SUE BIRD | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.93k | £1.55k | £419 | £3.40k | £13.59k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.52k | £2.25k | £2.39k | £1.74k | £11.95k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £500 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 13 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 30 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 13 March 2022 | 133 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 20 January 2021 | 81 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 14 JANUARY 1992 AS AMENDED 9 MARCH 1993, 8 MARCH 1994, 9 SEPTEMBER AND 9 DECEMBER 1997. FURTHER AMENDED 8 JUNE 1999 AND 11 JANUARY 2000.
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS WITHIN THE AREA OF BENEFIT WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX SEXUAL ORIENTATION RACE OR OF POLITICAL RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID INHABITANTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS
Area of benefit
LONG WHATTON AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD
Contact information
- Address:
-
Manor Farm
Long Whatton
Loughborough
Leiceste
- Phone:
- 01509646413
- Email:
- silke.walker@btconnect.com
- Website:
-
leicestershirevillages.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window