Financial history THE COVENTRY FAMILY HISTORY SOCIETY

Charity number: 1070160
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £5.86k £5.44k £5.65k £5.14k £5.84k
Total expenditure £6.60k £4.93k £5.62k £5.04k £6.10k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A