Accounts and annual returns ROBINS KIDS CLUB ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1063328
Charity reporting is overdue by 1765 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 304 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 304 days
Annual return 31 August 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 670 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 670 days
Annual return 31 August 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1035 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1035 days
Annual return 31 August 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1400 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1400 days
Annual return 31 August 2019 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1765 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1765 days