Financial history MANCHESTER ENVIRONMENTAL RESOURCE CENTRE INITIATIVE LTD

Charity number: 1077362
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2012 31/03/2013 31/03/2014 31/03/2015 31/05/2016
Total gross income £413.99k £186.68k £163.12k £131.50k £111.46k
Total expenditure £417.71k £233.31k £177.29k £160.78k £129.55k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £9.00k £0