CREDITCARE SUPPORT AND DEBT ADVICE ASSOCIATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 25 March 1997: Standard registration
- 05 December 2007: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- CREDITCURE SUPPORT AND DEBT ADVICE ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2005 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2005 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2004 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2004 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 2 OCTOBER 1996 AS AMENDED 14 FEBRUARY 1997
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE POVERTY AND TO PROTECT AND PRESERVE THE GOOD HEALTH OF PERSONS SUFFERING FROM STRESS RELATED ILLNESS DUE TO THEIR POVERTY AND OF PERSONS WHO HAVE LOST A FRIEND OR RELATIVE THROUGH DEBT RELATED SUICIDE BY THE PROVISION OF DEBT COUNCELLING AND BEREAVEMENT COUNSELLING SERVICES
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window