Accounts and annual returns BURTON-UPON-TRENT ROUND TABLE CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity Number: 1061762
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 18 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 29 May 2024 119 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 10 March 2023 38 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 08 November 2022 281 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 09 February 2021 9 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required