INSTITUTE OF WELSH AFFAIRS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Institute of Welsh Affairs is a membership-based think-tank and policy research institute aimed at promoting new thinking on Welsh issues. Its activities include the publication of research reports and discussion papers, and the organisation of seminars and conferences throughout Wales covering a range of interests, including the economy, education, health, and the environment.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

11 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£80k to £90k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- The General Public/mankind
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout Wales
Governance
- 01 December 1999: Standard registration
- IWA (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ben Gordon Joakim | Chair | 18 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Gwendolyn Helena Sterk | Trustee | 11 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Shayoni Sarkar Lynn | Trustee | 11 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lauren Maeve McEvatt | Trustee | 11 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jessica McQuade | Trustee | 18 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Elizabeth Zaidee Haywood | Trustee | 18 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Samuel Richard Evans | Trustee | 18 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kelly Marie Roberts | Trustee | 18 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Alison Copus | Trustee | 24 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Anthony Pickles | Trustee | 24 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
HELEN FRANCIS MORTLOCK PEARCE | Trustee | 16 December 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £302.34k | £449.72k | £340.94k | £482.65k | £413.61k | |
|
Total expenditure | £340.93k | £369.40k | £422.60k | £398.72k | £402.36k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £56.32k | £19.42k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 08 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 08 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 08 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 08 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 07 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 07 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 24 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 24 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 11 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 11 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 22 JULY 1987 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 20 JUNE 1999 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 06 DEC 2006 as amended on 25 Nov 2020
Charitable objects
2.1 The Objects of the Charity are to advance the education of the general public of, and to promote research into (and the publication of the results thereof), socio-economics, politics, science and technology, including but not limited to:- (a) the effect of socio-economic, political and scientific factors on public policy; and (b) the effect of socio-economic, financial, political, environmental and international factors on the living standards of all sections of the community.
Area of benefit
WALES
Contact information
- Address:
-
Institute Of Welsh Affairs
Room 6.01
SBARC
Maindy Road
Cardiff
CF24 4HQ
- Phone:
- 02920484387
- Email:
- info@iwa.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window