THE BUILTH MALE VOICE CHOIR (COR MEIBION LLANFAIR YM MUALLT)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Performance and promotion of male voice choral music through concerts in Wales, the rest of Britain and Europe. Exchange visits with other male voice choirs. Assisting voluntary and charitable causes to raise funds for special projects.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 November 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Carmarthenshire
- Cornwall
- Gwynedd
- Herefordshire
- Powys
- Shropshire
Governance
- 17 April 1997: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ian Martin Coldrick | Chair | 15 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Gareth Jones | Trustee | 31 January 2019 |
|
|||||
Vivian Jones | Trustee | 20 August 2018 |
|
|
||||
ADRIAN MORGAN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/11/2019 | 30/11/2020 | 30/11/2021 | 30/11/2022 | 30/11/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £14.28k | £5.15k | £1.83k | £16.18k | £8.56k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.54k | £5.62k | £2.22k | £15.55k | £9.18k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 November 2023 | 26 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2022 | 19 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2021 | 29 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2020 | 03 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2019 | 28 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 14/10/1996 AS AMENDED ON 17/02/1997 AS AMENDED ON 10/12/2012
Charitable objects
THE STUDY AND PRACTICE OF CHORAL MUSIC IN ORDER TO FOSTER PUBLIC KNOWLEDGE AND APPRECIATION OF SUCH MUSIC BY PUBLIC PERFORMANCE
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
13 Irfon Road
BUILTH WELLS
Powys
LD2 3DE
- Phone:
- 01982 552043
- Email:
- bmvc.eventsmanager@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window