BLACKBURN WITH DARWEN CITIZENS ADVICE BUREAU LIMITED
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Citizens Advice service provides free, independent, confidential and impartial advice to everyone on their rights and responsibilities. It values diversity, promotes equality and challenges discrimination. Our aims are to provide the advice people need for the problems they face and to improve the policies and practices that affect people's lives.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2018
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Blackburn With Darwen
Governance
- 07 August 1997: Standard registration
- 04 March 2019: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- 04 March 2019: Funds transferred to 1078558 Citizens Advice Lancashire West
- BLACKBURN WITH DARWEN CAB (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | 30/06/2018 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £206.11k | £253.49k | £199.92k | £142.70k | £146.22k | |
|
Total expenditure | £217.30k | £208.06k | £216.60k | £187.06k | £174.92k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £0 | £25.00k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £25.00k | £0 | £6.00k | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2018 | 18 October 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2018 | 18 October 2018 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2017 | 09 October 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2017 | 09 October 2017 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2016 | 16 November 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2016 | 16 November 2016 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2015 | 05 November 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2015 | 05 November 2015 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 25 MARCH 1997 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 8 FEBRUARY 2000 AND 17 FEBRUARY 2009
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION OF ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY IN BLACKBURN WITH DARWEN AND SURROUNDING AREAS (THE AREA OF BENEFIT) BY THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, THE PROTECTION AND PRESERVATION OF GOOD HEALTH AND THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, SICKNESS AND DISTRESS
Area of benefit
BLACKBURN WITH DARWEN AND SURROUNDING AREAS
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window