ERASMUS DARWIN FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity's Objects are to create, manage and develop a suitable memorial to Erasmus Darwin which is done by opening Erasmus Darwin House, Lichfield to the public and holding events and exhibitions.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023
Total income includes £1,500 from 1 government grant(s)
People

12 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Staffordshire
Governance
- 21 July 1997: Standard registration
- ERASMUS DARWIN FOUNDATION AT ERASMUS DARWIN HOUSE (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DR NICHOLAS ANTHONY CAMBRIDGE | Chair |
|
|
|||||
DENIS GAYE BLAKE-ROBERTS | Trustee | 16 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Simon David John Chaplin | Trustee | 29 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr PATRICIA FARA | Trustee | 31 January 2018 |
|
|||||
Robert William Brown | Trustee | 14 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
DR CHRISTOPHER MARK LOCKWOOD CM | Trustee | 27 July 2011 |
|
|
||||
REV CANON ANTHONY NEVIN BARNARD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MRS M E BUDGEN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JENNIFER EVELYN RUSSELL ARTHUR | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
STUART HARRIS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DAVID JOHN KERSHAW | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MR J BARLOW | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £82.57k | £127.09k | £90.67k | £83.87k | £92.15k | |
|
Total expenditure | £62.60k | £88.09k | £79.85k | £86.18k | £124.41k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £2.50k | £30.58k | £39.31k | £5.50k | £1.50k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 09 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | 09 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 07 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | 07 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 29 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | 29 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 20 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | 20 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 11 September 2020 | 11 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | 11 September 2020 | 11 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON 29 OCTOBER 1996 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 1 JULY 1997 AND 14 MAY 2010
Charitable objects
1) THE PRESERVATION, PROTECTION AND IMPROVEMENT FOR PUBLIC BENEFIT AS A NATIONAL MONUMENT OF ANY BUILDING OR BUILDINGS OF NATIONAL HISTORICAL ARCHITECTURAL OR ARTISTIC OR SCIENTIFIC INTEREST AND IMPORTANCE INCLUDING ANY ANCILLARY BUILDINGS 2) THE PRESERVATION, PROTECTION AND IMPROVEMENT FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT OF ANY AMENITY OR OTHER LAND 3) THE PRESERVATION PROTECTION AND IMPROVEMENT FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT OF ALL FURNITURE PICTURES HISTORIC RECORDS BOOKS MANUSCRIPTS MONUMENTS ARMOUR PORCELAIN SILVER AND GOLD OBJECTS D'ART AND OTHER CHATTELS OR ITEMS OF NATIONAL HISTORIC ARTISTIC OR SCIENTIFIC INTEREST ASSOCIATED WITH OR DISPLAYED IN ANY SUCH BUILDING OR BUILDINGS 4) THE ENCOURAGEMENT OF THE PROVISION OF ACCESS TO AND THE STUDY OF SUCH BUILDINGS LAND FURNITURE PICTURES AND OTHER CHATTELS OR ITEMS AND OF THE LIFE AND WORKS OF ERASMUS DARWIN (BEING THE ONE WHO LIVED BETWEEN 1731 AND 1802) BY MEMBERS OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC 5) THE ENCOURAGEMENT OF THE STUDY RESEARCH AND EDUCATION IN THE FIELDS OF INTEREST AND/OR INFLUENCE OF ERASMUS DARWIN BY MEMBERS OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC. FOR FULL DETAILS SEE CLAUSE 3 OF THE MEMORANDUM.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
ANSONS
5 BREADMARKET STREET
LICHFIELD
WS13 6LQ
- Phone:
- 01543263456
- Email:
- enquiries@erasmusdarwin.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window