Trustees ORWELL PARK SCHOOL EDUCATIONAL TRUST LTD
Charity number: 310481

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Callum Donald Licence | Chair | 17 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
James Piper | Trustee | 11 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Patrick Marshall | Trustee | 11 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Katie Lawson | Trustee | 23 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
William Davison | Trustee | 23 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Timothy Pasco | Trustee | 23 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Oliver Asplin Hearsey | Trustee | 23 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Katharine Prest | Trustee | 13 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Tom Sexton | Trustee | 13 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Crispin Symes | Trustee | 19 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Roland Arthur Stuart Mallinson | Trustee | 21 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Phillip Evans | Trustee | 14 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Clarke | Trustee | 09 February 2015 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.