GERSON SUPPORT GROUP
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provide information and contacts and support to Cancer Sufferers. Advance awareness of The GERSON Nutritional Therapy
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2021
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 29 July 1997: Standard registration
- 26 January 2022: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- G.S.G. (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2017 | 05/04/2018 | 05/04/2019 | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.90k | £10.61k | £4.36k | £0 | £334.23k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.16k | £10.03k | £5.63k | £587 | £4.82k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 06 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 06 January 2022 | On Time | |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 03 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2019 | 23 February 2020 | 18 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2019 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2018 | 31 October 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2018 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 16 JUNE 1997
Charitable objects
A) TO RELIEVE SICKNESS AND TO PRESERVE AND PROTECT GOOD HEALTH BY PROVIDING SUPPORT TO CANCER PATIENTS AND OTHERS SUFFERING FROM DEGENERATIVE DISEASES B) TO ADVANCE PUBLIC EDUCATION IN THE GERSON NUTRITIONAL THERAPY
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window