Financial history PAUL SMITH'S FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1065751
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £98.57k £132.68k £132.68k £200.95k £159.64k
Total expenditure £51.68k £317.40k £315.25k £490.88k £299.41k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A