Financial history THE WOODEN CANAL BOAT SOCIETY LIMITED

Charity Number: 1069820
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £58.55k £51.53k £77.40k £68.28k £77.14k
Total expenditure £79.67k £12.13k £19.18k £65.45k £66.05k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £27.00k N/A N/A N/A